Docket for 16-7184
No. 16-7184 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
James Lynn Styers, Petitioner |
v. |
Charles L. Ryan, Director, Arizona Department of Corrections |
|
Docketed: | December 14, 2016 |
Linked with 16A229 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (12-16952) |
Decision Date: | December 29, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | July 27, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Aug 15 2016 |
Application (16A229) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 25, 2016 to December 9, 2016, submitted to Justice Kennedy. |
Sep 6 2016 |
Application (16A229) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until December 9, 2016. |
Dec 9 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 13, 2017) |
Jan 9 2017 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including February 13, 2017. |
Feb 13 2017 |
Brief of respondent Charles L. Ryan, Director, Arizona Department of Corrections in opposition filed. |
Feb 27 2017 |
Reply of petitioner James Lynn Styers filed. |
Mar 2 2017 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 17, 2017. |
Mar 20 2017 |
Petition DENIED. |
|