Docket for 16-7105
No. 16-7105 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
William Clyde Gibson, III, Petitioner |
v. |
Indiana |
|
Docketed: | December 8, 2016 |
Linked with 16A264 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Indiana |
Case Nos.: | (22S00-1206-DP-00360) |
Decision Date: | April 12, 2016 |
Rehearing Denied: | June 29, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Sep 7 2016 |
Application (16A264) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 27, 2016 to November 26, 2016, submitted to Justice Kagan. |
Sep 13 2016 |
Application (16A264) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until November 26, 2016. |
Nov 28 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 9, 2017) |
Jan 9 2017 |
Brief of respondent Indiana in opposition filed. |
Jan 26 2017 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 17, 2017. |
Feb 21 2017 |
Petition DENIED. |
|