Docket for 16-7043
No. 16-7043 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Gregory C. Osie, Petitioner |
v. |
Ohio |
|
Docketed: | November 30, 2016 |
Lower Ct: | Court of Appeals of Ohio, Butler County |
Case Nos.: | (CA2014-10-222) |
Decision Date: | August 24, 2015 |
Discretionary Court | |
Decision Date: | August 31, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Nov 28 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 30, 2016) |
Dec 27 2016 |
Brief of respondent Ohio in opposition filed. |
Jan 12 2017 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 17, 2017. |
Feb 21 2017 |
Petition DENIED. |
|