Docket for 16-7032
No. 16-7032 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Christopher Young, Petitioner |
v. |
Lorie Davis, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division |
|
Docketed: | November 30, 2016 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (15-70023) |
Decision Date: | August 31, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Nov 29 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 30, 2016) |
Dec 8 2016 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including January 30, 2017. |
Jan 30 2017 |
Brief of respondent Lorie Davis, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division in opposition filed. |
Feb 10 2017 |
Reply of petitioner Christopher Young filed. |
Feb 16 2017 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 3, 2017. |
Mar 6 2017 |
Petition DENIED. |
|