Docket for 16-6995
No. 16-6995 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Howard Hawk Willis, Petitioner |
v. |
Tennessee |
|
Docketed: | November 28, 2016 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Tennessee, Eastern Division |
Case Nos.: | (E2012-01313-SC-DDT-DD) |
Decision Date: | July 6, 2016 |
Rehearing Denied: | August 23, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Nov 21 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 28, 2016) |
Dec 19 2016 |
Supplemental brief of petitioner Howard Hawk Willis filed. |
Jan 3 2017 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including January 27, 2017. |
Jan 27 2017 |
Brief of respondent Tennessee in opposition filed. |
Feb 16 2017 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 3, 2017. |
Feb 16 2017 |
Reply of petitioner Howard Hawk Willis filed. (Distributed) |
Mar 6 2017 |
Petition DENIED. |
|