Docket for 16-6953
No. 16-6953 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Marlon Latodd Howell, Petitioner |
v. |
Mississippi |
|
Docketed: | November 23, 2016 |
Linked with 16A380 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Mississippi |
Case Nos.: | (2015-DR-01138-SCT) |
Decision Date: | July 28, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Oct 14 2016 |
Application (16A380) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 26, 2016 to November 25, 2016, submitted to Justice Thomas. |
Oct 20 2016 |
Application (16A380) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until November 25, 2016. |
Nov 21 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 23, 2016) |
Jan 9 2017 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including January 23, 2017. |
Jan 20 2017 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including February 2, 2017. |
Jan 31 2017 |
Brief of respondent Mississippi in opposition filed. |
Feb 16 2017 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 3, 2017. |
Mar 6 2017 |
Petition DENIED. |
|