Docket for 16-6903
No. 16-6903 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Richard Jordan, et al., Petitioners |
v. |
Marshall L. Fisher, Commissioner, Mississippi Department of Corrections, et al. |
|
Docketed: | November 18, 2016 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (15-60604) |
Decision Date: | June 27, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Sep 26 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 19, 2016) |
Dec 8 2016 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including January 18, 2017. |
Jan 18 2017 |
Brief of respondents Marshall L. Fisher, Commissioner, Mississippi Department of Corrections, et al. in opposition filed. |
Feb 2 2017 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 17, 2017. |
Feb 13 2017 |
Reply of petitioners Richard Jordan, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Feb 21 2017 |
Petition DENIED. |
|