Docket for 16-6603
No. 16-6603 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Anthony Sully, Petitioner |
v. |
Ron Davis, Warden |
|
Docketed: | October 28, 2016 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (15-17428) |
Decision Date: | March 29, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jun 26 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 28, 2016) |
Nov 23 2016 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 28, 2016. |
Dec 21 2016 |
Brief of respondent Ron Davis, Warden in opposition filed. |
Jan 4 2017 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 19, 2017. |
Jan 9 2017 |
Reply of petitioner Anthony Sully filed. (Distributed) |
Jan 23 2017 |
Petition DENIED. |
|