Docket for 16-6498
No. 16-6498 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Floyd Damren, Petitioner |
v. |
Florida, et al. |
|
Docketed: | October 20, 2016 |
Linked with 16A138 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (13-15017) |
Decision Date: | January 21, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | May 18, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Aug 2 2016 |
Application (16A138) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 16, 2016 to October 15, 2016, submitted to Justice Thomas. |
Aug 10 2016 |
Application (16A138) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until October 15, 2016. |
Oct 17 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 21, 2016) |
Nov 16 2016 |
Brief amicus curiae of The Ethics Bureau at Yale filed. |
Nov 30 2016 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 21, 2016. |
Dec 21 2016 |
Brief of respondents Florida, et al. in opposition filed. |
Jan 3 2017 |
Reply of petitioner Floyd Damren filed. (Distributed) |
Jan 4 2017 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 19, 2017. |
Jan 23 2017 |
Petition DENIED. |
|