Docket for 16-6467
No. 16-6467 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Cedric Carter, Petitioner |
v. |
Charlotte Jenkins, Warden |
|
Docketed: | October 19, 2016 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (13-3996) |
Decision Date: | July 13, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Oct 11 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 18, 2016) |
Nov 18 2016 |
Brief of respondent Charlotte Jenkins, Warden in opposition filed. |
Dec 8 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 6, 2017. |
Jan 9 2017 |
Petition DENIED. |
|