Docket for 16-6445
No. 16-6445 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Raymond Deleon Martinez, Petitioner |
v. |
Lorie Davis, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division |
|
Docketed: | October 18, 2016 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (15-70017) |
Decision Date: | June 24, 2016 |
Rehearing Denied: | July 25, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Oct 13 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 17, 2016) |
Nov 17 2016 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 19, 2016. |
Dec 20 2016 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including January 18, 2017. |
Jan 18 2017 |
Brief of respondent Lorie Davis, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division in opposition filed. |
Jan 30 2017 |
Reply of petitioner Raymond Deleon Martinez filed. (Distributed) |
Feb 2 2017 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 17, 2017. |
Mar 29 2017 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 31, 2017. |
Apr 3 2017 |
Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Moore v. Texas, 581 U. S. ____ (2017). |
May 5 2017 |
JUDGMENT ISSUED. |
|