~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Aug 10 2016 |
Application (16A160) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 23, 2016 to October 22, 2016, submitted to Justice Alito. |
Aug 15 2016 |
Application (16A160) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until September 22, 2016. |
Sep 16 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 20, 2016) |
Oct 19 2016 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 21, 2016. |
Nov 23 2016 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including December 21, 2016. |
Dec 29 2016 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including January 23, 2017. |
Jan 23 2017 |
Brief of respondent Pennsylvania in opposition filed. |
Feb 6 2017 |
Reply of petitioner Omar Sharif Cash filed. |
Feb 9 2017 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 24, 2017. |
Feb 27 2017 |
Petition DENIED. |