~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jun 1 2016 |
Application (15A1244) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 12, 2016 to September 9, 2016, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
Jun 8 2016 |
Application (15A1244) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until September 9, 2016. |
Sep 9 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 14, 2016) |
Oct 14 2016 |
Brief amicus curiae of The Federal Republic of Germany filed. |
Oct 19 2016 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 14, 2016. |
Nov 22 2016 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including December 14, 2016. |
Dec 14 2016 |
Brief of respondent South Carolina in opposition filed. |
Dec 28 2016 |
Reply of petitioner Charles Christopher Williams filed. (Distributed) |
Dec 29 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 13, 2017. |
Jan 4 2017 |
Record Requested . |
Jan 12 2017 |
Supplemental brief of petitioner Charles Christopher Williams filed. |
Jan 19 2017 |
Record received from the Supreme Court of South Carolina. The record is electronic. |
Feb 2 2017 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 17, 2017. |
Feb 13 2017 |
Rescheduled. |
Apr 5 2017 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 21, 2017. |
Apr 24 2017 |
Petition DENIED. Justice Gorsuch took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. |