Docket for 16-578
No. 16-578 | |
Title: |
Paul Bishop, et al., Petitioners |
v. |
Wells Fargo & Co., et al. |
|
Docketed: | October 28, 2016 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (15-2449) |
Decision Date: | May 5, 2016 |
Rehearing Denied: | August 19, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Oct 28 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 28, 2016) |
Nov 14 2016 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 28, 2016. |
Dec 28 2016 |
Brief of respondents Wells Fargo & Co., et al. in opposition filed. |
Jan 11 2017 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 17, 2017. |
Jan 11 2017 |
Reply of petitioners Paul Bishop, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Feb 21 2017 |
Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Universal Health Services, Inc. v. United States ex rel. Escobar, 579 U. S. ___ (2016). |
Mar 27 2017 |
JUDGMENT ISSUED. |
|