Docket for 16-5507
No. 16-5507 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Errol Duke Moses, Petitioner |
v. |
Edward Thomas, Warden |
|
Docketed: | August 9, 2016 |
Linked with 15A1157 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (15-2) |
Decision Date: | March 8, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
May 6 2016 |
Application (15A1157) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 6, 2016 to August 5, 2016, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
May 11 2016 |
Application (15A1157) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until August 5, 2016. |
Aug 5 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 8, 2016) |
Aug 17 2016 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including October 11, 2016. |
Oct 10 2016 |
Brief of respondent Edward Thomas, Warden in opposition filed. |
Oct 19 2016 |
Reply of petitioner Errol Duke Moses filed. |
Oct 26 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 10, 2016. |
Feb 22 2017 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 24, 2017. |
Feb 27 2017 |
Petition DENIED. |
|