Docket for 16-5307
No. 16-5307 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
LeJames Norman, Petitioner |
v. |
Lorie Davis, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division |
|
Docketed: | July 21, 2016 |
Linked with 15A1228 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (15-70034) |
Decision Date: | March 18, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
May 25 2016 |
Application (15A1228) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 16, 2016 to July 18, 2016, submitted to Justice Thomas. |
Jun 8 2016 |
Application (15A1228) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until July 18, 2016. |
Jul 18 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 22, 2016) |
Aug 19 2016 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including September 21, 2016. |
Sep 16 2016 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including October 21, 2016. |
Oct 21 2016 |
Brief of respondent Lorie Davis, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division in opposition filed. |
Nov 8 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 22, 2016. |
Feb 22 2017 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 24, 2017. |
Feb 27 2017 |
Petition DENIED. |
|