Docket for 16-228
No. 16-228 | |
Title: |
Vincent Forras, et al., Petitioners |
v. |
Imam Feisal Abdul Rauf, et al. |
|
Docketed: | August 19, 2016 |
Linked with 16A64 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (14-7070) |
Decision Date: | February 12, 2016 |
Rehearing Denied: | April 19, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jul 13 2016 |
Application (16A64) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 18, 2016 to September 1, 2016, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
Jul 15 2016 |
Application (16A64) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until July 28, 2016. |
Jul 28 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 19, 2016) |
Jul 28 2016 |
Supplemental appendix of Vincent Forras, et al. filed. |
Aug 8 2016 |
Waiver of right of respondent Adam Leitman Bailey to respond filed. |
Oct 5 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 28, 2016. |
Oct 31 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
|