Docket for 16-1236
No. 16-1236 | |
Title: |
John P. Quinn, et al., Petitioners |
v. |
City of Detroit, Michigan, et al. |
|
Docketed: | April 14, 2017 |
Linked with 16A758 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (15-2337, 15-2353, 15-2379 ) |
Decision Date: | October 3, 2016 |
Rehearing Denied: | November 17, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jan 26 2017 |
Application (16A758) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 15, 2017 to April 14, 2017, submitted to Justice Kagan. |
Jan 26 2017 |
Application (16A758) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until April 14, 2017. |
Apr 14 2017 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 15, 2017) |
May 2 2017 |
Waiver of right of respondents City of Detroit, et al. Michigan to respond filed. |
May 12 2017 |
Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Ad Hoc Committee of Allied Nevada, Inc., Shareholders. |
May 30 2017 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 15, 2017. |
Jun 19 2017 |
Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Ad Hoc Committee of Allied Nevada, Inc., Shareholders GRANTED. |
Jun 19 2017 |
Petition DENIED. |
|