Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 16-1017
No. 16-1017
Title:
Laith G. Cox, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:February 24, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Armed Forces
  Case Nos.:(16-0635/AR)
  Decision Date:January 17, 2017
Rule 12.4

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Feb 21 2017 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 27, 2017)
Mar 22 2017 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including April 26, 2017.
Apr 19 2017 Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including May 15, 2017.
May 15 2017 Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
May 19 2017 Reply of petitioner Laith G. Cox filed. VIDED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Stephen I. Vladeck 727 East Dean Keeton Street(512) 475-9198
    Counsel of RecordAustin, TX  78705
svladeck@law.utexas.edu
Party name: Laith G. Cox
Attorneys for Respondent:
Jeffrey B. Wall Acting Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
    Counsel of Record United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: United States
June 30, 2017 | Version 2014.2