Docket for 15A392
No. 15A392 | |
Title: |
George Yono, et ux., Applicants |
v. |
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, et al. |
|
Docketed: | October 13, 2015 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Oct 8 2015 |
Application (15A392) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 8, 2015 to December 7, 2015, submitted to Justice Kagan. |
Oct 13 2015 |
Application (15A392) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until December 7, 2015. |
|