Docket for 15A368
No. 15A368 | |
Title: |
Curtis J. Neeley, Jr., Applicant |
v. |
Louis Jerry Edwards, et al. |
|
Docketed: | September 16, 2015 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Sep 8 2015 |
Application (15A368) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 16, 2015 to November 15, 2015, submitted to Justice Alito. |
Sep 16 2015 |
Application (15A368) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until November 16, 2015. |
|