Docket for 15-9657
No. 15-9657 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Ramon Sandoval, Jr., Petitioner |
v. |
California |
|
Docketed: | June 10, 2016 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of California |
Case Nos.: | (S115872) |
Decision Date: | December 24, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | March 9, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jun 7 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 11, 2016) |
Jul 11 2016 |
Brief of respondent California in opposition filed. |
Jul 25 2016 |
Reply of petitioner Ramon Sandoval, Jr. filed. (Distributed) |
Jul 28 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 26, 2016. |
Oct 3 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
|