Docket for 15-9638
No. 15-9638 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Bobby T. Sheppard, Petitioner |
v. |
Norm Robinson, Warden |
|
Docketed: | June 7, 2016 |
Linked with 15A810 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (13-3165) |
Decision Date: | December 8, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | January 5, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jan 20 2016 |
Application (15A810) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 4, 2016 to June 3, 2016, submitted to Justice Kagan. |
Feb 2 2016 |
Application (15A810) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until June 3, 2016. |
Jun 3 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 7, 2016) |
Jul 7 2016 |
Brief of respondent Norm Robinson, Warden in opposition filed. |
Jul 21 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 26, 2016. |
Aug 4 2016 |
Reply of petitioner Bobby T. Sheppard filed. (Distributed) |
Feb 22 2017 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 24, 2017. |
Feb 27 2017 |
Petition DENIED. |
|