Docket for 15-9624
No. 15-9624 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Julius Darius Jones, Petitioner |
v. |
Kevin Duckworth, Interim Warden |
|
Docketed: | June 7, 2016 |
Linked with 15A895 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (13-6141) |
Decision Date: | November 10, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | January 5, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Feb 16 2016 |
Application (15A895) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 4, 2016 to June 3, 2016, submitted to Justice Sotomayor. |
Feb 26 2016 |
Application (15A895) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until June 3, 2016. |
Jun 3 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 7, 2016) |
Jun 23 2016 |
Brief of respondent Kevin Duckworth, Interim Warden in opposition filed. |
Jul 1 2016 |
Reply of petitioner Julius Darius Jones filed. |
Jul 7 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 26, 2016. |
Oct 3 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
|