Docket for 15-9603
No. 15-9603 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Brandon E. Lacy, Petitioner |
v. |
Arkansas |
|
Docketed: | June 6, 2016 |
Linked with 15A1139 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Arkansas |
Case Nos.: | (CR-15-171) |
Decision Date: | February 4, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
May 3 2016 |
Application (15A1139) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 4, 2016 to July 3, 2016, submitted to Justice Alito. |
May 5 2016 |
Application (15A1139) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until June 3, 2016. |
Jun 2 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 6, 2016) |
Jun 17 2016 |
Brief of respondent Arkansas in opposition filed. |
Jul 7 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 26, 2016. |
Oct 3 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
|