Docket for 15-9545
No. 15-9545 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Aric Shayne Woodard, Petitioner |
v. |
Pennsylvania |
|
Docketed: | May 31, 2016 |
Linked with 15A1056 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Pennsylvania, Eastern District |
Case Nos.: | (692 CAP) |
Decision Date: | December 3, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | January 25, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Apr 11 2016 |
Application (15A1056) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 24, 2016 to June 23, 2016, submitted to Justice Alito. |
Apr 15 2016 |
Application (15A1056) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until May 25, 2016. |
May 25 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 30, 2016) |
Jul 20 2016 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 18, 2016. |
Aug 18 2016 |
Brief of respondent Pennsylvania in opposition filed. |
Sep 1 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 26, 2016. |
Oct 3 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
|