Docket for 15-9512
No. 15-9512 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Richard Andrew Poplawski, Petitioner |
v. |
Pennsylvania |
|
Docketed: | May 27, 2016 |
Linked with 15A1064 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Pennsylvania, Eastern District |
Case Nos.: | (654 CAP) |
Decision Date: | December 29, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | February 1, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Apr 13 2016 |
Application (15A1064) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 1, 2016 to June 30, 2016, submitted to Justice Alito. |
Apr 18 2016 |
Application (15A1064) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until May 31, 2016. |
May 24 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 27, 2016) |
Jun 21 2016 |
Brief of respondent Pennsylvania in opposition filed. |
Jul 21 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 26, 2016. |
Oct 3 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
|