Docket for 15-9429
No. 15-9429 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
William Bryon Leonard, Petitioner |
v. |
E. K. McDaniel, Warden |
|
Docketed: | May 23, 2016 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Nevada |
Case Nos.: | (60337) |
Decision Date: | October 22, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | February 19, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
May 19 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 22, 2016) |
Jun 21 2016 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including July 22, 2016. |
Jul 13 2016 |
Brief of respondent E. K. McDaniel, Warden in opposition filed. |
Jul 28 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 26, 2016. |
Oct 3 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
|