~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Feb 24 2016 |
Application (15A903) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 13, 2016 to May 12, 2016, submitted to Justice Alito. |
Mar 3 2016 |
Application (15A903) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until April 13, 2016. |
Apr 13 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 16, 2016) |
May 13 2016 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including June 15, 2016. |
Jun 10 2016 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including July 15, 2016. |
Jul 12 2016 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including August 15, 2016. |
Aug 11 2016 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including September 14, 2016. |
Sep 7 2016 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including October 14, 2016. |
Oct 12 2016 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including November 28, 2016. |
Nov 21 2016 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including January 9, 2017. |
Jan 5 2017 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including February 8, 2017. |
Jan 27 2017 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including March 13, 2017. |
Mar 13 2017 |
Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. |
Mar 22 2017 |
Reply of petitioner Daniel Lee filed. |
Mar 29 2017 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 13, 2017. |
Apr 17 2017 |
Petition DENIED. Justice Gorsuch took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. |