Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 15-8884
No. 15-8884
Title:
David Jeep, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:April 8, 2016
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(15-3403)
  Decision Date:February 1, 2016
  Rehearing Denied:March 10, 2016

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Mar 14 2016 Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 9, 2016)
Apr 21 2016 Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Apr 27 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 12, 2016.
May 16 2016 The motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is denied, and the petition for a writ of certiorari is dismissed. See Rule 39.8.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
David G. Jeep General Delivery(314) 514-5228
Saint Louis, MO  63155-9999
Dave@DGJeep.com
Party name: David Jeep
Attorneys for Respondent:
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
    Counsel of Record United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: United States
June 25, 2017 | Version 2014.2