Docket for 15-868
No. 15-868 | |
Title: |
City of Houston, Texas, Petitioner |
v. |
Christopher Zamora |
|
Docketed: | January 8, 2016 |
Linked with 15A616 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (14-20125) |
Decision Date: | August 19, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | October 6, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Dec 10 2015 |
Application (15A616) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 4, 2016 to February 3, 2016, submitted to Justice Scalia. |
Dec 11 2015 |
Application (15A616) denied by Justice Scalia. |
Jan 4 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 8, 2016) |
Feb 3 2016 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including March 9, 2016. |
Feb 8 2016 |
Brief amici curiae of International Municipal Lawyers Association, et al. filed. |
Feb 8 2016 |
Brief amici curiae of Texas Municipal League, et al. filed. |
Feb 8 2016 |
Brief amicus curiae of Harris County, Texas filed. |
Feb 8 2016 |
Brief amici curiae of Metropolitan Transit Authority of Harris County, Texas, et al. filed. |
Mar 7 2016 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including April 8, 2016. |
Apr 8 2016 |
Brief of respondent Christopher Zamora in opposition filed. |
Apr 25 2016 |
Reply of petitioner City of Houston, Texas filed. |
Apr 26 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 12, 2016. |
May 16 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
|
|
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | | |
Paul D. Clement |
Bancroft PLLC | (202) 234-0090 |
| 500 New Jersey Ave., NW | |
| Seventh Floor | |
| Washington, DC 20001 | |
| pclement@bancroftpllc.com |
Party name: City of Houston, Texas |
Attorneys for Respondent: | | |
Randall L. Kallinen |
511 Broadway Street | 713-320-3785 |
Counsel of Record | Houston, TX 77012 | |
| attorneykallinen@aol.com |
Party name: Christopher Zamora |
Other: | | |
Thomas G. Hungar |
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP | (202) 955-8500 |
| 1050 Connecticut Ave, N.W. | |
| Washington, DC 20036 | |
| thungar@gibsondunn.com |
Party name: International Municipal Lawyers Association, et al. |
| | |
Bruce S. Powers |
Harris County Attorney's Ofc. | (713) 274-5144 |
| 1019 Congress, 15th Floor | |
| Houston, TX 77002 | |
| bruce.powers@cao.hctx.net |
Party name: Harris County, Texas |
| | |
David J. Quan |
808 Travis, 20th Floor | (713) 225-5300 |
| Houston, TX 77002 | |
| dquan@davidquanlaw.com |
Party name: Metropolitan Transit Authority of Harris County, Texas, et al. |
| | |
Ramon G. Viada III. |
Viada & Strayer | (281) 419-6338 |
| 17 Swallow Tail Court, Suite 100 | |
| Houston, TX 77381 | |
| rayviada@viadastrayer.com |
Party name: Texas Municipal League, et al. |