Docket for 15-8673
No. 15-8673 | |
Title: |
John Witherow, Petitioner |
v. |
Howard Skolnik, et al. |
|
Docketed: | March 24, 2016 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (13-17361) |
Decision Date: | December 24, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Mar 22 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 25, 2016) |
Apr 21 2016 |
Waiver of right of respondent Embarq Payphone Services, Inc. a/k/a Century Linck Public Communication, Inc. to respond filed. |
Apr 25 2016 |
Brief of respondent Global Tel*Link Corporation's in opposition filed. |
May 11 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 26, 2016. |
May 31 2016 |
The motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is denied, and the petition for a writ of certiorari is dismissed. See Rule 39.8. |
|