Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results

        

Docket for 15-866
No. 15-866
Title:
Star Athletica, L.L.C., Petitioner
v.
Varsity Brands, Inc., et al.
Docketed:January 7, 2016
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(14-5237)
  Decision Date:August 19, 2015
  Rehearing Denied:October 7, 2015
Questions Presented

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Jan 5 2016 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 8, 2016)
Jan 21 2016 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including March 4, 2016.
Feb 5 2016 Brief amici curiae of Public Knowledge, et al. filed.
Feb 8 2016 Brief amici curiae of FormLabs Inc., et al. filed.
Mar 4 2016 Brief of respondents Varsity Brands, Inc., et al. in opposition filed.
Mar 23 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 15, 2016.
Mar 23 2016 Reply of petitioner Star Athletica, L.L.C. filed. (Distributed)
Apr 18 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 22, 2016.
Apr 25 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 29, 2016.
May 2 2016 Petition GRANTED limited to Question 1 presented by the petition.
May 10 2016 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the petitioner.
May 17 2016 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for respondents.
May 26 2016 The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including July 15, 2016.
May 26 2016 The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including September 14, 2016.
May 26 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Royal Manticoran Navy: The Official Honor Harrington Fan Association, Inc. filed.
Jul 15 2016 Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Jul 15 2016 Brief of petitioner Star Athletica, L.L.C. filed.
Jul 21 2016 Brief amici curiae of Public Knowledge, et al. filed.
Jul 22 2016 Brief amici curiae of Professors Christopher Buccafusco and Jeanne Fromer filed.
Jul 22 2016 Brief amici curiae of Intellectual Property Professors filed.
Jul 22 2016 Brief amicus curiae of American Intellectual Property Law Association in support of neither party filed.
Jul 22 2016 Brief amicus curiae of New York Intellectual Property Law Association in support of neither party filed.
Jul 22 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Intellectual Property Law Association of Chicago in support of neither party filed.
Sep 2 2016 SET FOR ARGUMENT On Monday, October 31, 2016
Sep 9 2016 Record has been requested from the U.S.C.A. 6th Circuit.
Sep 14 2016 Brief of respondents Varsity Brands, Inc., et al. filed.
Sep 15 2016 Record received from the U.S.D.C. Eastern District of Michigan ( 2 Boxes ).
Sep 19 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Intellectual Property Owners Association filed.
Sep 21 2016 Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Sep 21 2016 Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Sep 21 2016 Brief amici curiae of Professors Jeannie Suk Gersen and C. Scott Hemphill filed.
Sep 21 2016 Brief amici curiae of Fashion Law Institute, et al. filed.
Sep 21 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Chosun International, Inc. filed.
Sep 21 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Council of Fashion Designers of America, Inc. filed.
Sep 28 2016 CIRCULATED
Oct 11 2016 Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Oct 14 2016 Reply of petitioner Star Athletica, L.L.C. filed. (Distributed)
Oct 31 2016 Argued. For petitioner: John J. Bursch, Caledonia, Mich. For respondents: William M. Jay, Washington, D. C.; and Eric J. Feigin, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.)



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
John J. Bursch Bursch Law PLLC(616) 450-4235
    Counsel of Record9339 Cherry Valley Avenue SE, #78
Caledonia, MI  49319
jbursch@burschlaw.com
Party name: Star Athletica, L.L.C.
 
John J. Bursch Warner Norcross & Judd LLP(616) 752-2000
900 Fifth Third Center
111 Lyon Street, N.W.
Grand Rapids, MI  49503
JBursch@wnj.com
Party name: Star Athletica, L.L.C.
Attorneys for Respondents:
William M. Jay Goodwin Procter LLP(202) 346-4000
    Counsel of Record901 New York Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20001
wjay@goodwinprocter.com
Party name: Varsity Brands, Inc., et al.
Other:
David L. Applegate Williams Montgomery & John Ltd.(312) 443-3200
6100 Willis Tower
233 South Wqcker Drive
Chicago, IL  60606
dla@willmont.com
Party name: Intellectual Property Law Association of Chicago
 
Charles E. Boulbol Charles E. Boulbol, P.C.(212) 825-9457
26 Broadway, 17th Floor
New York, NY  10004
rtrack@msn.com
Party name: Council of Fashion Designers of America, Inc.
 
Amie Peele Carter Fagre Baker Daniels LLP(317) 237-0300
300 North Meridian Street
Suite 2700
Indianapolis, IN  46204
amie.peelecarter@faegrebd.com
Party name: American Intellectual Property Law Association in support of neither party
 
Charles Duan Public Knowledge(202) 861-0020
1818 N Street, NW, Suite 410
Washington, DC  20036
cduan@publicknowledge.org
Party name: Public Knowledge, et al.
 
Lauren Beth Emerson Baker Botts LLP(212) 408-2500
30 Rockefeller Plaza
New York, NY  10112
lauren.emerson@bakerbotts.com
Party name: New York Intellectual Property Law Association
 
Meir Feder Jones Day(212) 326-3755
222 East 41st Street
New York, NY  10017
mfeder@jonesday.com
Party name: Professors Christopher Buccafusco and Jeanne Fromer
 
Eric J. Feigin Assistant to the Solicitor General(202)-305-2452
Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Ave. NW
Washington, DC  20530
eric.feigin@usdoj.gov
Party name: United States
 
Ian Heath Gershengorn Acting Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: United States
 
Anthony H. Handal Handal & Morofsky, LLC(917) 880-0811
83 East Avenue, Suite 308
Norwalk, CT  06851
handal@handalglobal.com
Party name: Chosun International, Inc.
 
David Leichtman Robins, Kaplan, L.L.P.(212) 980-7400
601 Lexington Avenue
New York, NY  10022
dleichtman@robinskaplan.com
Party name: Intellectual Property Owners Association
 
Mark A. Lemley William H. Neuman Professor(650) 723-4605
Stanford Law School
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA  94305-
mlemley@law.stanford.edu
Party name: Intellectual Property Professors
 
Phillip Robert Malone Stanford Law School(650) 725-6369
Juelsgaard Intellectual Property and Innovation Clinic
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA  94305
pmalone@law.stanford.edu
Party name: FormLabs Inc., et al.
 
Michelle Mancino Marsh Arent Fox, LLP(212) 484-3900
1675 Broadway
New York, NY  10019
michelle.marsh@arentfox.com
Party name: Fashion Law Institute, et al.
 
Judith Schwartz Sherwin Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard Smith LLP(312) 463-3319
550 West Adams Street
Suite 300
Chicago, IL  60661
judith.sherwin@lewisbrisbois.com
Party name: Royal Manticoran Navy: The Official Honor Harrington Fan Association, Inc.
 
Scott Block Wilkens Jenner & Block, LLP(202) 639-6000
1099 New York Ave., NW, Suite 1099
Washington, DC  20005
swilkens@jenner.com
Party name: Professors Jeannie Suk Gersen and C. Scott Hemphill
December 07, 2016 | Version 2014.2