Docket for 15-8605
No. 15-8605 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Keith Gavin, Petitioner |
v. |
Alabama |
|
Docketed: | March 18, 2016 |
Linked with 15A591 |
Lower Ct: | Court of Criminal Appeals of Alabama |
Case Nos.: | (CR-10-1313) |
Decision Date: | August 22, 2014 |
Rehearing Denied: | March 20, 2015 |
Discretionary Court | |
Decision Date: | October 23, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Dec 2 2015 |
Application (15A591) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 21, 2016 to February 22, 2016, submitted to Justice Thomas. |
Dec 7 2015 |
Application (15A591) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until February 22, 2016. |
Feb 22 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 18, 2016) |
Apr 15 2016 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including May 18, 2016. |
May 17 2016 |
Brief of respondent Alabama in opposition filed. |
May 27 2016 |
Reply of petitioner Keith Gavin filed. |
Jun 1 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 16, 2016. |
Mar 13 2017 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 17, 2017. |
Mar 20 2017 |
Petition DENIED. |
|