Docket for 15-8444
No. 15-8444 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Kim Jackson, Petitioner |
v. |
Florida |
|
Docketed: | March 7, 2016 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Florida |
Case Nos.: | (SC13-2090) |
Decision Date: | August 27, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | December 18, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Mar 1 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 6, 2016) |
Apr 6 2016 |
Brief of respondent Florida in opposition filed. |
Apr 20 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 12, 2016. |
May 16 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
|