Docket for 15-8260
No. 15-8260 | |
Title: |
Beverley D. Wilson, Petitioner |
v. |
Stephen P. Williams |
|
Docketed: | February 22, 2016 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of South Carolina |
Case Nos.: | (2015-001883) |
Decision Date: | September 10, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Dec 9 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 23, 2016) |
Mar 22 2016 |
Brief of respondent Stephen P. Williams in opposition filed. |
Apr 7 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 22, 2016. |
Apr 25 2016 |
The motion of petitioner for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is denied. Petitioner is allowed until May 16, 2016, within which to pay the docketing fee required by Rule 38(a) and to submit a petition in compliance with Rule 33.1 of the Rules of this Court. |
Aug 11 2016 |
Case considered closed. |
|