~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Oct 27 2015 |
Application (15A470) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 18, 2015 to January 17, 2016, submitted to Justice Kagan. |
Oct 29 2015 |
Application (15A470) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until January 17, 2016. |
Jan 19 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 22, 2016) |
Mar 7 2016 |
Brief of respondent Bruce Westbrooks, Warden in opposition filed. |
Mar 8 2016 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including March 7, 2016. |
Mar 23 2016 |
Reply of petitioner Charles Walton Wright filed. |
Mar 24 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 15, 2016. |
Apr 18 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
May 9 2016 |
Petition for Rehearing filed. |
May 17 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 2, 2016. |
Jun 6 2016 |
The respondent is requested to file a response to the petition for rehearing within 30 days (Response due July 6, 2016). |
Jul 1 2016 |
Response to petition for rehearing from respondent Bruce Westbrooks, Warden filed. |
Aug 31 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 26, 2016. |
Feb 22 2017 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 24, 2017. |
Feb 23 2017 |
Letter of February 22, 2017 from counsel for petitioner received. |
Feb 27 2017 |
Rehearing DENIED. |