Docket for 15-7442
No. 15-7442 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
William John Keck, Petitioner |
v. |
Nevada |
|
Docketed: | December 18, 2015 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Nevada |
Case Nos.: | (61675) |
Decision Date: | April 21, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | September 17, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Dec 16 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 19, 2016) |
Jan 14 2016 |
Brief of respondent Nevada in opposition filed. |
Jan 27 2016 |
Reply of petitioner William John Keck filed. (Distributed) |
Jan 28 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 19, 2016. |
Feb 29 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
|