Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 15-7160
No. 15-7160
Title:
Mark K. Arness, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:December 1, 2015
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Armed Forces
  Case Nos.:(14-8014)
  Decision Date:August 19, 2015

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Sep 22 2015 Motion (15M45) for leave to proceed as a veteran filed.
Sep 22 2015 Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 31, 2015)
Oct 14 2015 MOTION (15M45) DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 30, 2015.
Nov 2 2015 Motion (15M45) for leave to proceed as a veteran Denied.
Dec 10 2015 Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Dec 16 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 8, 2016.
Jan 11 2016 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Mark K. Arness 2874 Ivory Lane(443) 975-5374
Port Republic, MD  20676-2054
Party name: Mark K. Arness
Attorneys for Respondent:
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
    Counsel of Record United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543