~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Sep 24 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 16, 2015) |
Dec 14 2015 |
Brief of respondent Alhambra Hospital Medical Center in opposition filed. |
Dec 23 2015 |
Reply of petitioner Cedric Greene, Jr. filed. |
Dec 31 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 15, 2016. |
Jan 19 2016 |
The motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is denied, and the petition for a writ of certiorari is dismissed. See Rule 39.8. |
Jan 28 2016 |
Motion for reconsideration of order denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by petitioner. |
Feb 10 2016 |
Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 26, 2016. |
Feb 29 2016 |
Motion for reconsideration of order denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by petitioner DENIED. |