Docket for 15-642
No. 15-642 | |
Title: |
OIP Technologies, Inc., Petitioner |
v. |
Amazon.com, Inc. |
|
Docketed: | November 16, 2015 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (2012-1696) |
Decision Date: | June 11, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | August 13, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Nov 12 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 16, 2015) |
Nov 17 2015 |
Waiver of right of respondent Amazon.com, Inc. to respond filed. |
Nov 23 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of December 11, 2015. |
Dec 14 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
|