Docket for 15-630
No. 15-630 | |
Title: |
Renee Baker, Warden, Petitioner |
v. |
Billy Ray Riley |
|
Docketed: | November 13, 2015 |
Linked with 15A295 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (11-99004) |
Decision Date: | May 15, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | June 29, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Sep 9 2015 |
Application (15A295) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 27, 2015 to November 26, 2015, submitted to Justice Kennedy. |
Sep 15 2015 |
Application (15A295) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until November 12, 2015. |
Nov 9 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 14, 2015) |
Dec 7 2015 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including February 12, 2016. |
Feb 12 2016 |
Brief of respondent Billy Ray Riley in opposition filed. |
Feb 12 2016 |
Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Billy Ray Riley. |
Feb 25 2016 |
Reply of petitioner Renee Baker, Warden filed. |
Mar 2 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 18, 2016. |
Mar 21 2016 |
Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent GRANTED. |
Mar 21 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
|