~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Sep 3 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 9, 2015) |
Sep 16 2015 |
Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed. |
Sep 24 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 9, 2015. |
Sep 30 2015 |
Response Requested . (Due October 30, 2015) |
Oct 19 2015 |
Memorandum of respondent United States filed. |
Nov 5 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 24, 2015. |
Apr 20 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 22, 2016. |
Apr 25 2016 |
Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Molina-Martinez v. United States, 578 U. S. ___ (2016). |