~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
May 2 2015 |
Application (14A1272) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 18, 2015 to July 17, 2015, submitted to Justice Alito. |
Jun 18 2015 |
Application (14A1272) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until July 17, 2015. |
Jul 17 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 20, 2015) |
Aug 18 2015 |
Brief of respondent Wal-Mart, Inc. in opposition filed. (Printed Brief) |
Aug 18 2015 |
Brief of respondent Ticketmaster, LLC in opposition filed. |
Sep 3 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 28, 2015. |
Oct 5 2015 |
The motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is denied, and the petition for a writ of certiorari is dismissed. See Rule 39.8. As the petitioner has repeatedly abused this Court's process, the Clerk is directed not to accept any further petitions in noncriminal matters from petitioner unless the docketing fee required by Rule 38(a) is paid and the petition is submitted in compliance with Rule 33.1. See Martin v. District of Columbia Court of Appeals, 506 U. S. 1 (1992) (per curiam). |
Oct 14 2015 |
Motion for reconsideration of order denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by petitioner. |
Oct 28 2015 |
Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 13, 2015. |
Nov 16 2015 |
Motion for reconsideration of order denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by petitioner DENIED. |