Docket for 15-5141
No. 15-5141 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Daniel Lee Lopez, Petitioner |
v. |
William Stephens, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division |
|
Docketed: | July 10, 2015 |
Linked with 15A48 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (14-70025) |
Decision Date: | April 6, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jul 6 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 10, 2015) |
Jul 6 2015 |
Application (15A48) for a stay of execution of sentence of death, submitted to Justice Scalia. |
Jul 30 2015 |
Brief of respondent William Stephens, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division in opposition filed. |
Aug 5 2015 |
Reply of petitioner Daniel Lee Lopez filed. |
Aug 12 2015 |
Application (15A48) referred to the Court. |
Aug 12 2015 |
The motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and the petition for a writ of certiorari are denied. Justices Ginsburg and Sotomayor would vote to grant the motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. |
Aug 12 2015 |
Application (15A48) denied by the Court. |
|