Docket for 14-9065
No. 14-9065 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
David Dewayne Riley, Petitioner |
v. |
Alabama |
|
Docketed: | March 26, 2015 |
Linked with 14A843 |
Lower Ct: | Court of Criminal Appeals of Alabama |
Case Nos.: | (CR-10-0988) |
Decision Date: | August 30, 2013 |
Discretionary Court | |
Decision Date: | November 21, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jan 30 2015 |
Application (14A843) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 19, 2015 to March 23, 2015, submitted to Justice Thomas. |
Feb 10 2015 |
Application (14A843) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until March 23, 2015. |
Mar 23 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 27, 2015) |
Apr 7 2015 |
Brief of respondent Alabama in opposition filed. |
Apr 22 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 14, 2015. |
May 18 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
|