Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 14-748
No. 14-748
Title:
Volvo Powertrain Corporation, Petitioner
v.
United States, et al.
Docketed:December 24, 2014
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
  Case Nos.:(12-5234)
  Decision Date:July 18, 2014
  Rehearing Denied:September 24, 2014

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Dec 23 2014 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 23, 2015)
Dec 31 2014 Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Jan 2 2015 Waiver of right of respondent California Air Resources Board to respond filed.
Jan 28 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 20, 2015.
Feb 5 2015 Response Requested . (Due March 9, 2015)
Mar 3 2015 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including April 8, 2015, for all respondents.
Mar 9 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Alliance of Automobile Manufacturers filed.
Mar 9 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Atlantic Legal Foundation filed.
Mar 9 2015 Brief amici curiae of National Association of Manufacturers, et al. filed.
Mar 20 2015 Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including May 8, 2015, for all respondents.
May 8 2015 Brief of respondent United States filed.
May 8 2015 Brief of respondent California Air Resources Board in opposition filed.
May 22 2015 Reply of petitioner Volvo Powertrain Corporation filed.
May 26 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 11, 2015.
Jun 15 2015 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Donald W. Fowler 1350 I Street, NW, 9th Floor (202) 898-5800
    Counsel of RecordWashington, DC  20005
dfowler@hollingsworthllp.com
Party name: Volvo Powertrain Corporation
Attorneys for Respondents:
Linda Gandara Deputy Attorney General(916) 445-4853
    Counsel of Record 1300 I Street, Suite 125
P.O. Box 944255
Sacramento, CA  94244-2550
Linda.Gandara@doj.ca.gov
Party name: California Air Resources Board
 
Nicholas C. Stern 1300 I Street Suite 125(916)-323-3840
    Counsel of RecordSacramento, CA  95814
Party name: California Air Resources Board
 
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
    Counsel of Record United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: United States
Other:
Philip S. Goldberg Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP(202) 662-4800
1155 F Street NW, Suite 200
Washington, DC  20004-1305
pgoldberg@shb.com
Party name: Alliance of Automobile Manufacturers
 
Martin S. Kaufman Atlantic Legal Foundation(914) 834-3322
2039 Palmer Avenue #104
Larchmont, NY  10538
mskaufman@atlanticlegal.org
Party name: Atlantic Legal Foundation
 
Laurence H. Tribe 1575 Massachusetts Avenue(617) 495-1767
Cambridge, MA  02138
tribe@law.harvard.edu
Party name: National Association of Manufacturers, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543