Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results

        

Docket for 14-316
No. 14-316
Title:
Conan Doyle Estate, Ltd., Petitioner
v.
Leslie S. Klinger
Docketed:September 17, 2014
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
  Case Nos.:(14-1128)
  Decision Date:June 16, 2014

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Sep 15 2014 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 17, 2014)
Sep 15 2014 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or neither party, received from counsel for petitioner.
Oct 7 2014 Waiver of right of respondent Leslie S. Klinger to respond filed.
Oct 15 2014 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 31, 2014.
Nov 3 2014 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
John J. Bursch Warner Norcross & Judd LLP(616) 752-2000
    Counsel of Record900 Fifth Third Center
111 Lyon Street, N.W.
Grand Rapids, MI  49503
JBursch@wnj.com
Party name: Conan Doyle Estate, Ltd.
Attorneys for Respondent:
Scott M. Gilbert Polsinelli PC(312) 819-1900
    Counsel of Record161 N. Clark St., Suite 4200
Chicago, IL  60601
sgilbert@polsinelli.com
Party name: Scott S. Klinger
February 26, 2017 | Version 2014.2