Docket for 14-1327
No. 14-1327 | |
Title: |
Concepcion Amaya, Petitioner |
v. |
IndyMac Federal Bank, FSB |
|
Docketed: | May 7, 2015 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Florida |
Case Nos.: | (SC14-2336) |
Decision Date: | December 3, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Feb 14 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 8, 2015) |
Jun 24 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 28, 2015. |
Oct 5 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
|