Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 14-1216
No. 14-1216
Title:
Richard Enos, et al., Petitioners
v.
Loretta E. Lynch, Attorney General, et al.
Docketed:April 9, 2015
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(12-15498)
  Decision Date:October 16, 2014
  Rehearing Denied:January 13, 2015

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Apr 7 2015 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 11, 2015)
May 6 2015 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including May 26, 2015.
May 26 2015 Brief of respondents Loretta E. Lynch, Attorney General, et al. in opposition filed.
Jun 9 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 25, 2015.
Jun 9 2015 Reply of petitioners Richard Enos, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Jun 29 2015 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioners:
Donald E. J. Kilmer Jr. Law Offices of Donald Kilmer, APC(408) 264-8489
    Counsel of Record1645 Willow Street, Suite 150
San Jose, CA  95125
don@dklawoffice.com
Party name: Richard Enos, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents:
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
    Counsel of Record United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: Loretta E. Lynch, Attorney General, et al.
June 23, 2017 | Version 2014.2